GA HB1384 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-04 - Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 11 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-04 - Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 8-2-23 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to amendment and revision of codes generally, so as to require the department to amend the Georgia state minimum standard codes to authorize certain uses of ungraded lumber; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Buildings and housing; amend Georgia state minimum standard codes to authorize certain uses of ungraded lumber; require
Sponsors
Rep. David Jenkins [R] | Rep. Beth Camp [R] | Rep. Gerald Greene [R] | Rep. Rick Jasperse [R] |
Rep. David Knight [R] | Sen. Lee Anderson [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-04 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #836 (Y: 49 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - House - Passage: House Vote #674 (Y: 149 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2022-03-11 - House - Passage: House Vote #674 (Y: 149 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 24) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-04 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-03-11 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2022-03-11 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-03-09 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-02-24 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-02-22 | House | House First Readers |
2022-02-17 | House | House Hopper |