GA HB1379 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-08 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-03-08 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 35 of the O.C.G.A., relating to law enforcement officers and agencies, so as to establish the Georgia Motor Vehicle Crime Prevention Commission; to provide for definitions; to assign such commission to the Georgia Bureau of Investigation; to provide for membership; to provide for compensation of members; to provide for duties; to authorize the acceptance of funds; to provide for the establishment of a grant program to support local law enforcement agencies and multi-jurisdiction task forces relative to motor vehicle related crime prevention initiatives; to provide for standards and conditions for such grant program; to provide for recommendations and reporting; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Georgia Motor Vehicle Crime Prevention Commission; establish
Sponsors
Rep. John Corbett [R] | Rep. Jason Ridley [R] | Rep. James Burchett [R] | Rep. Don Hogan [R] |
Rep. Trey Rhodes [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-08 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2022-03-03 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2022-02-24 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-02-24 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-02-22 | House | House First Readers |
2022-02-17 | House | House Hopper |