GA HB1371 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-11 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Government Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-11 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Government Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 1 of Title 31 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions regarding health, so as to provide for the creation of the Rural Health Advancement Commission; to provide for purpose, membership, terms, meetings, expenses, and powers; to provide for reporting; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Rural Health Advancement Commission; create
Sponsors
Rep. Rick Jasperse [R] | Sen. Sam Watson [R] | Rep. John Corbett [R] | Rep. Terry England [R] |
Rep. Joe Campbell [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-09 - House - Passage: House Vote #637 (Y: 156 N: 4 NV: 2 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-11 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-03-09 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2022-03-09 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-03-03 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2022-02-22 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-02-17 | House | House First Readers |
2022-02-15 | House | House Hopper |