GA HB1355 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-02 - Effective Date 2022-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on May 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-02 - Effective Date 2022-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 41 of Title 31 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to lead poisoning prevention, so as to update provisions to comport with nationally recognized guidelines; to revise definitions; to revise provisions relating to abatement of lead poisoning hazards; to expand written advisement requirements; to expand applicability of provisions; to provide for related matters; to provide for a funding contingency; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Childhood Lead Exposure Control Act; revise
Sponsors
Rep. Katie Dempsey [R] | Rep. Sharon Cooper [R] | Rep. Karla Drenner [D] | Rep. Matthew Gambill [R] |
Rep. Mark Newton [R] | Rep. Mesha Mainor [D] | Sen. Ben Watson [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-05 - House - Agree To Senate Substitute: House Vote #915 (Y: 153 N: 5 NV: 4 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #859 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - Passage: House Vote #596 (Y: 163 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2022-04-04 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #859 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-03-03 - House - Passage: House Vote #596 (Y: 163 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-02 | Effective Date 2022-07-01 | |
2022-05-02 | Act 776 | |
2022-05-02 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2022-04-07 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2022-04-04 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-03-03 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2022-03-03 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-02-24 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-02-17 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-02-15 | House | House First Readers |
2022-02-14 | House | House Hopper |