GA HB134 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 1 of Article 5A of Chapter 8 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions regarding the special district mass transportation sales and use tax, so as to change the definition of transportation purposes regarding such tax; to change certain provisions relating to special districts and the imposition of such tax; to change certain provisions relating to notice, intergovernmental agreements, and resolutions regarding such tax; to change certain provisions relating to the ballot question regarding such tax; to change certain provisions relating to the commencement of imposition and the timing of cessation of such tax; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sales and use tax; special district mass transportation; provisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-30 - House - House Vote #410 (Y: 122 N: 40 NV: 7 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #243 (Y: 50 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House Vote #95 (Y: 106 N: 58 NV: 7 Abs: 9) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-01 Effective Date
2017-05-01 Act 54
2017-05-01HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2017-04-05HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2017-03-30HouseHouse Agreed Senate Amend or Sub
2017-03-24SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2017-03-24SenateSenate Third Read
2017-03-24SenateSenate Engrossed
2017-03-15SenateSenate Read Second Time
2017-03-14SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-02-24SenateSenate Read and Referred
2017-02-23HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2017-02-23HouseHouse Third Readers
2017-02-16HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-01-30HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-01-26HouseHouse First Readers
2017-01-25HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback