GA HB134 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Part 1 of Article 5A of Chapter 8 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions regarding the special district mass transportation sales and use tax, so as to change the definition of transportation purposes regarding such tax; to change certain provisions relating to special districts and the imposition of such tax; to change certain provisions relating to notice, intergovernmental agreements, and resolutions regarding such tax; to change certain provisions relating to the ballot question regarding such tax; to change certain provisions relating to the commencement of imposition and the timing of cessation of such tax; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Sales and use tax; special district mass transportation; provisions
Sponsors
Rep. James Epps [R] | Rep. Buzz Brockway [R] | Rep. Ron Stephens [R] | Rep. Al Williams [D] |
Sen. Sam Watson [R] | Rep. Jay Powell [R] | Sen. Brandon Beach [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-30 - House - House Vote #410 (Y: 122 N: 40 NV: 7 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #243 (Y: 50 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House Vote #95 (Y: 106 N: 58 NV: 7 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-03-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #243 (Y: 50 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - House Vote #95 (Y: 106 N: 58 NV: 7 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-01 | Effective Date | |
2017-05-01 | Act 54 | |
2017-05-01 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2017-04-05 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2017-03-30 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-02-24 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-02-23 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2017-02-23 | House | House Third Readers |
2017-02-16 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-01-30 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-01-26 | House | House First Readers |
2017-01-25 | House | House Hopper |