GA HB1335 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-04 - Effective Date 2022-04-04
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Passed on April 4 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-04 - Effective Date 2022-04-04
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 4 of Title 1 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to holidays and observances, so as to provide for Public Safety Week; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Holidays and observances; provide for Public Safety Week
Sponsors
Rep. Calvin Smyre [D] | Rep. Carolyn Hugley [D] | Rep. Debbie Buckner [D] | Rep. Vance Smith [R] |
Rep. Donna McLeod [D] | Sen. Jeff Mullis [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-01 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #802 (Y: 49 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - House - Passage: House Vote #724 (Y: 152 N: 2 NV: 10 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2022-03-15 - House - Passage: House Vote #724 (Y: 152 N: 2 NV: 10 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-04 | Effective Date 2022-04-04 | |
2022-04-04 | Act 588 | |
2022-04-04 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2022-04-04 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-03-16 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-03-15 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2022-03-15 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-03-15 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2022-03-11 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2022-02-15 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-02-14 | House | House First Readers |
2022-02-11 | House | House Hopper |