GA HB131 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Vetoed on May 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-09 - Veto V1
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 9 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-09 - Veto V1
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to incorporate the City of South Fulton in Fulton County, Georgia, approved April 26, 2016 (Ga. L. 2016, p. 3726), so as to change the corporate boundaries of the municipality; to provide for related matters; to provide a contingent effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
South Fulton, City of; change corporate boundaries
Sponsors
Rep. Roger Bruce [D] | Rep. William Boddie [D] | Rep. Debra Bazemore [D] | Rep. Derrick Jackson [D] |
Rep. Sharon Beasley-Teague [D] | Rep. Wendell Willard [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #213 (Y: 52 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House Vote #21 (Y: 164 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-02-02 - House - House Vote #21 (Y: 164 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-09 | Veto V1 | |
2017-05-09 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2017-04-03 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-02-02 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2017-02-02 | House | House Third Readers |
2017-02-02 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-01-30 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-01-26 | House | House First Readers |
2017-01-25 | House | House Hopper |