GA HB1307 | 2009-2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 20-2-200 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to teacher certification, so as to temporarily suspend professional learning requirements for certification renewal for teachers and paraprofessionals; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Teacher certification; learning requirements for renewal; temporarily suspend
Sponsors
Rep. Rick Austin [R] | Rep. Amy Carter [R] | Rep. David Casas [R] | Rep. Tom Dickson [R] |
Rep. Howard Maxwell [R] | Rep. Jay Neal [R] | Sen. Dan Weber [R] |
Roll Calls
2010-04-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #856 - Passage (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2010-05-20 | Act 413 | |
2010-05-20 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2010-05-10 | House Sent to Governor | |
2010-04-27 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2010-04-27 | Senate Third Read | |
2010-04-14 | Senate Read Second Time | |
2010-04-14 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-03-24 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2010-03-22 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2010-03-22 | House Third Readers | |
2010-03-11 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2010-03-10 | House Second Readers | |
2010-03-09 | House First Readers |