GA HB1301 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-24 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-24 - House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 60 of Title 36 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions applicable to counties and municipal corporations, so as to prohibit rules and regulations related to gasoline-powered leaf blowers except by general law; to provide for a short title; to provide for legislative findings; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Landscape Equipment and Agricultural Fairness (LEAF) Act; enact
Sponsors
Rep. Don Hogan [R] | Sen. Sam Watson [R] | Rep. Matthew Gambill [R] | Rep. Patty Stinson [D] |
Rep. Steven Meeks [R] | Sen. Ricky Williams [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-24 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2022-02-14 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-02-11 | House | House First Readers |
2022-02-10 | House | House Hopper |