GA HB130 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 60 of Title 36 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions applicable to counties and municipal corporations, so as to define the term "fence detection system"; to limit the ability of counties, consolidated governments, and municipalities to regulate or prohibit such systems; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Local government; fence detection system; define term
Sponsors
Rep. Joseph Gullett [R] | Rep. Steven Sainz [R] | Sen. Ricky Williams [R] | Rep. Micah Gravley [R] |
Rep. Martin Momtahan [R] | Rep. Philip Singleton [R] | Sen. Randy Robertson [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-17 - House - Passage: House Vote #55 (Y: 100 N: 63 NV: 5 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | Senate | Senate Recommitted |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2021-02-18 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-02-17 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2021-02-17 | House | House Third Readers |
2021-02-11 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-01-29 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-01-28 | House | House First Readers |
2021-01-27 | House | House Hopper |