GA HB1281 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-11 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-11 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act creating the Ware County Water and Sewer Authority, now known as the Satilla Regional Water and Sewer Authority, approved October 1, 2001 (Ga. L. 2001, Ex. Sess., p. 705), as amended, so as to allow members to be elected for unlimited consecutive terms; to repeal a provision relating to expansion of services and addition of members; to reduce the number of days of nonpayment beyond which the authority may disconnect service; to raise the maximum fee for reconnection of service; to exempt the authority from sales and use taxes; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Satilla Regional Water and Sewer Authority; members to be elected for unlimited consecutive terms; allow
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-29 - Senate - Senate Vote #806 - Local Consent Calendar (Y: 53 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - House - House Vote #731 - Local Calendar (Y: 150 N: 5 NV: 17 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-03-22 - House - House Vote #731 - Local Calendar (Y: 150 N: 5 NV: 17 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | Effective Date | |
2012-04-11 | Act 546 | |
2012-04-11 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2012-04-03 | House Sent to Governor | |
2012-03-29 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-29 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-03-26 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2012-03-22 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-22 | House Third Readers | |
2012-03-22 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-03-20 | House Second Readers | |
2012-03-19 | House First Readers |