GA HB128 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-24 - Effective Date 2024-01-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on April 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-24 - Effective Date 2024-01-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Titles 48 and 50 of the O.C.G.A., relating to revenue and taxation and state government, respectively, so as to provide for representation of minority business enterprises, women owned businesses, and veteran owned businesses in the area of procurement of state contracts for construction, services, equipment, and goods; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Revenue and taxation; representation of minority business enterprises, women and veteran owned businesses in procurement of state contracts; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Soo Hong [R] | Rep. Steven Sainz [R] | Rep. Josh Bonner [R] | Rep. Reynaldo Martinez [R] |
Rep. Al Williams [D] | Rep. David Huddleston [R] | Sen. Mike Hodges [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-23 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #287 (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - House - Passage: House Vote #164 (Y: 160 N: 3 NV: 8 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-03-06 - House - Passage: House Vote #164 (Y: 160 N: 3 NV: 8 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-24 | Effective Date 2024-01-01 | |
2023-04-24 | Act 21 | |
2023-04-24 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2023-03-30 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2023-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2023-03-06 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2023-03-06 | House | House Third Readers |
2023-03-02 | House | House Postponed |
2023-02-15 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2023-02-01 | House | House Second Readers |
2023-01-31 | House | House First Readers |
2023-01-30 | House | House Hopper |