GA HB1274 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-01 - Senate Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-01 - Senate Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 1 of Title 50 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions relative to state government, so as to provide for the definition of antisemitism; to require state agencies and departments to consider such definition when determining whether an alleged act was motivated by discriminatory antisemitic intent; to provide for limitations and construction; to provide legislative findings; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
State government; antisemitism; provide definition
Sponsors
Rep. John Carson [R] | Rep. Michael Wilensky [D] | Rep. Chuck Efstration [R] | Rep. Angelika Kausche [D] |
Rep. Sharon Cooper [R] | Rep. Stacey Evans [D] | Sen. Bill Cowsert [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-28 - House - Passage: House Vote #569 (Y: 141 N: 19 NV: 5 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-01 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2022-03-01 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-02-28 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2022-02-28 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-02-11 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-02-10 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-02-08 | House | House First Readers |
2022-02-07 | House | House Hopper |