GA HB1271 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-01 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Government Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2022 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-01 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Government Oversight Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 44 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to property, so as to prohibit covenants for a planned subdivision and a property owners' association which infringe upon a lot owner's right to display the United States and Georgia flags; to provide for applicability; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Property; covenants which infringe upon owners' right to display United States and Georgia flags; prohibit
Sponsors
Rep. James Burchett [R] | Rep. John Corbett [R] | Rep. Jason Ridley [R] | Rep. Steven Sainz [R] |
Rep. Mitchell Scoggins [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-28 - House - Passage: House Vote #571 (Y: 160 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-01 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-02-28 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2022-02-28 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-02-11 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2022-02-10 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-02-08 | House | House First Readers |
2022-02-07 | House | House Hopper |