GA HB126 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 1 of Title 15 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions for courts, so as to change provisions relating to the Judicial Qualifications Commission; to expand the membership of the commission and provide for panels; to provide for duties and responsibilities; to provide for appointment of members, filling of vacancies, and confirmation; to provide for definitions; to provide for rules; to provide for confidentiality and exceptions; to provide for a short title; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Courts; Judicial Qualifications Commission; change provisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-28 - House - House Vote #365 (Y: 164 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #263 (Y: 20 N: 32 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #264 (Y: 45 N: 8 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-09 - House - House Vote #35 (Y: 176 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-01 Effective Date
2017-05-01 Act 51
2017-05-01HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2017-04-05HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2017-03-28HouseHouse Agreed Senate Amend or Sub
2017-03-28SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2017-03-28SenateSenate Third Read
2017-03-22SenateSenate Read Second Time
2017-03-22SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-02-10SenateSenate Read and Referred
2017-02-09HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2017-02-09HouseHouse Third Readers
2017-02-07HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-01-26HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-01-25HouseHouse First Readers
2017-01-25HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/display/20172018/HB/126
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/163490.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/164405.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/164821.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/168956.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/169942.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/170212.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/170154.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=14770
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=15334
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=15333
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=15314

Bill Comments

feedback