GA HB1251 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-11 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-11 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to provide for the membership of the Dodge County - Eastman Development Authority; to provide a statement of authority; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; to provide for an effective date; and for other purposes.
Title
Dodge County-Eastman Development Authority; provide for membership
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #669 - Local Consent Calendar (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-19 - House - House Vote #700 - Local Calendar (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 26 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2012-03-19 - House - House Vote #700 - Local Calendar (Y: 142 N: 0 NV: 26 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | Effective Date | |
2012-04-11 | Act 485 | |
2012-04-11 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2012-04-02 | House Sent to Governor | |
2012-03-22 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-22 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-03-20 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2012-03-19 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-19 | House Third Readers | |
2012-03-19 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-03-14 | House Second Readers | |
2012-03-13 | House First Readers |