GA HB125 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 48-8-3 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to exemptions from state sales and use taxes, so as to create an exemption for certain tangible personal property sold or used to maintain, refit, or repair a boat during a single event to the extent that the aggregate value of such property exceeds $500,000.00; to provide definitions; to provide for related rules and regulations; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sales and use tax; certain tangible personal property sold or used to maintain a boat; create exemption

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Vote #345 (Y: 35 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - House Vote #413 (Y: 120 N: 45 NV: 6 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Vote #370 (Y: 27 N: 14 NV: 8 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Vote #371 (Y: 30 N: 15 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Vote #372 (Y: 32 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #297 (Y: 50 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House Vote #62 (Y: 152 N: 14 NV: 7 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-07-01 Effective Date
2017-05-01 Act 50
2017-05-01HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2017-04-05HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2017-03-30SenateSenate Agreed House Amend or Sub
2017-03-30HouseHouse Agreed Senate Amend or Sub As Amended
2017-03-30SenateSenate Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2017-03-30SenateSenate Taken from Table
2017-03-28SenateSenate Tabled
2017-03-28SenateSenate Engrossed
2017-03-14SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-03-13SenateSenate Recommitted
2017-03-10SenateSenate Read Second Time
2017-03-09SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-02-17SenateSenate Read and Referred
2017-02-16HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2017-02-16HouseHouse Third Readers
2017-02-09HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2017-01-26HouseHouse Second Readers
2017-01-25HouseHouse First Readers
2017-01-24HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/display/20172018/HB/125
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/163299.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/164929.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/165615.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/167752.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/168307.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/170530.pdf
Texthttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/20172018/170642.pdf
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=14823
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=15367
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=15503
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=15502
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=15501
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=15414
Roll Callhttp://www.legis.ga.gov/Legislation/en-US/vote.aspx?VoteID=15476

Bill Comments

feedback