GA HB125 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 1 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 48-8-3 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to exemptions from state sales and use taxes, so as to create an exemption for certain tangible personal property sold or used to maintain, refit, or repair a boat during a single event to the extent that the aggregate value of such property exceeds $500,000.00; to provide definitions; to provide for related rules and regulations; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Sales and use tax; certain tangible personal property sold or used to maintain a boat; create exemption
Sponsors
Rep. Ron Stephens [R] | Rep. Jay Powell [R] | Rep. Al Williams [D] | Rep. Craig Gordon [D] |
Rep. Trey Kelley [R] | Sen. Ben Watson [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Vote #345 (Y: 35 N: 16 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - House Vote #413 (Y: 120 N: 45 NV: 6 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Vote #370 (Y: 27 N: 14 NV: 8 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Vote #371 (Y: 30 N: 15 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Vote #372 (Y: 32 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #297 (Y: 50 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House Vote #62 (Y: 152 N: 14 NV: 7 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - House - House Vote #413 (Y: 120 N: 45 NV: 6 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Vote #370 (Y: 27 N: 14 NV: 8 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Vote #371 (Y: 30 N: 15 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Vote #372 (Y: 32 N: 15 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Vote #297 (Y: 50 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - House - House Vote #62 (Y: 152 N: 14 NV: 7 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2017-05-01 | Act 50 | |
2017-05-01 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2017-04-05 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Senate Agreed House Amend or Sub |
2017-03-30 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub As Amended |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Senate Recommitted |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-02-17 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-02-16 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2017-02-16 | House | House Third Readers |
2017-02-09 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-01-26 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-01-25 | House | House First Readers |
2017-01-24 | House | House Hopper |