GA HB1248 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-08 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-08 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act providing for the election of members of the Board of Education of Cobb County, approved March 28, 1974 (Ga. L. 1974, p. 3516), as amended, particularly by an Act approved April 20, 2012 (Ga. L. 2012, p. 5570), so as to change the description of the education districts of such board; to provide for definitions and inclusions; to provide for continuation in office of current members; to provide for the manner of election; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Cobb County; Board of Education; change description of districts
Sponsors
Rep. David Wilkerson [D] | Rep. Erick Allen [D] | Rep. Sheila Jones [D] | Rep. Teri Anulewicz [D] |
Rep. Erica Thomas [D] | Rep. Michael Smith [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-08 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2022-02-08 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-02-07 | House | House First Readers |
2022-02-07 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/61842 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20212022/205486 |