GA HB1236 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-11 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-11 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act creating a new charter for the City of Norcross, Georgia, approved March 28, 1990 (Ga. L. 1990, p. 4934), as amended, particularly by an Act approved April 13, 2001 (Ga. L. 2001, p. 3729), and an Act approved May 6, 2005 (Ga. L. 2005, p. 3876), so as to change the corporate limits of the City of Norcross; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Norcross, City of; change corporate limits
Sponsors
Rep. Pedro Marin [D] | Rep. Tom Rice [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-03-27 - Senate - Senate Vote #725 - Local Consent Calendar (Y: 41 N: 2 NV: 10 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - House - House Vote #695 - Local Calendar W/o Hb 1230 & Hb 1235 (Y: 146 N: 4 NV: 18 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - House - House Vote #695 - Local Calendar W/o Hb 1230 & Hb 1235 (Y: 146 N: 4 NV: 18 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | Effective Date | |
2012-04-11 | Act 477 | |
2012-04-11 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2012-04-05 | House Sent to Governor | |
2012-03-29 | House Agree Senate Amend or Sub | |
2012-03-27 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-27 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-03-19 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2012-03-14 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-14 | House Third Readers | |
2012-03-14 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-03-13 | House Second Readers | |
2012-03-12 | House First Readers |