GA HB1235 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-19 - House Lost Reconsidered Bill/Res
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-19 - House Lost Reconsidered Bill/Res
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act providing for the consolidated government of Augusta-Richmond County, approved March 27, 1995 (Ga. L. 1995, p. 3648), as amended, so as to provide that certain departments, agencies, and authorities of the consolidated government and certain private entities which contract with the consolidated government for the provision of government services shall have periodic forensic accounting audits; to provide for sanctions for failure to do so; to provide a short title; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Augusta-Richmond County Transparency in Government Act; enact
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-19 - House - House Vote #702 - Passage (Y: 54 N: 93 NV: 21 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2012-03-19 - House - House Vote #701 - Recon (Y: 141 N: 6 NV: 21 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - House - House Vote #694 - Passage (Y: 53 N: 92 NV: 23 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2012-03-14 - House - House Vote #693 - Remove From Local Calen (Y: 98 N: 44 NV: 26 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2012-03-19 - House - House Vote #701 - Recon (Y: 141 N: 6 NV: 21 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2012-03-14 - House - House Vote #694 - Passage (Y: 53 N: 92 NV: 23 Abs: 12) [FAIL]
2012-03-14 - House - House Vote #693 - Remove From Local Calen (Y: 98 N: 44 NV: 26 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-19 | House Lost Reconsidered Bill/Res | |
2012-03-19 | House Reconsidered | |
2012-03-14 | House Notice To Reconsider | |
2012-03-14 | House Third Reading Lost | |
2012-03-14 | House Third Readers | |
2012-03-14 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-03-13 | House Second Readers | |
2012-03-12 | House First Readers |