GA HB1234 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 29 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-07-29 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to amend, revise, consolidate, and supersede the several Acts incorporating the Town of Tallulah Falls in Habersham and Rabun counties, approved February 6, 1984 (Ga. L. 1984, p. 3547), as amended, particularly by an Act approved May 8, 2018 (Ga. L. 2018, p. 4044), an Act approved May 16, 2007 (Ga. L. 2007, p. 3533), and an Act approved March 22, 1990 (Ga. L. 1990, p. 4384); to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for the other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Tallulah Falls, Town of; terms, qualifications, election, and vacancies of mayor and councilmembers; modify provisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #742 (Y: 47 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-06-23 - House - House Vote #692 (Y: 151 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 18) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-07-29 Effective Date
2020-07-29 Act 537
2020-07-29HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2020-07-02HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2020-06-25SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2020-06-25SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2020-06-24SenateSenate Read and Referred
2020-06-23HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2020-06-23HouseHouse Third Readers
2020-06-23HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2020-06-20HouseHouse Second Readers
2020-06-19HouseHouse First Readers
2020-06-19HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback