GA HB1223 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-13 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate State and Local Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 12 2012 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-03-13 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate State and Local Governmental Operations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act providing for the numbering of positions of membership on the Cherokee County Board of Education, approved April 17, 1973 (Ga. L. 1973, p. 3207), as amended, particularly by an Act approved March 18, 1980 (Ga. L. 1980, p. 3275), and by an Act approved April 25, 2002 (Ga. L. 2002, p. 4869), so as to revise the districts for the election of members of the board of education; to provide for definitions and inclusions; to provide for manner of election; to provide for submission of this Act for preclearance pursuant to Section 5 of the federal Voting Rights Act of 1965, as amended; to provide for related matters; to provide for effective dates; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Cherokee County; Board of Education; revise districts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-12 - House - House Vote #683 - Local Calendar (Y: 127 N: 31 NV: 10 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-13 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2012-03-12 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-12 | House Third Readers | |
2012-03-12 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-03-07 | House Second Readers | |
2012-03-05 | House First Readers |