GA HB122 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-30 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-03-30 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 9 of Chapter 6 of Title 44 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the Uniform Statutory Rule Against Perpetuities, so as to change provisions relating to the validity of nonvested property interest or power of appointment; to change provisions relating to reform of disposition by court to approximate transferor's plan of distribution; to provide for application and construction of article; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Uniform Statutory Rule Against Perpetuities; validity of nonvested property interest or power of appointment; change provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Chuck Efstration [R] | Rep. Wendell Willard [R] | Rep. Jay Powell [R] | Rep. Albert Reeves [R] |
Rep. Scott Holcomb [D] | Sen. Brian Strickland [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-30 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2017-01-31 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2017-01-26 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-01-25 | House | House First Readers |
2017-01-24 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/49822 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20172018/163276 |