GA HB121 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-02 - Senate Tabled
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to incorporate the City of South Fulton in Fulton County, Georgia, approved April 26, 2016 (Ga. L. 2016, p. 3726), so as to change the corporate boundaries of the municipality; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

South Fulton, City of; change corporate boundaries

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-22 - House - House Vote #56 (Y: 157 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 11) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-02SenateSenate Tabled
2019-04-02SenateSenate Third Read
2019-03-29SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2019-02-25SenateSenate Read and Referred
2019-02-22HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2019-02-22HouseHouse Third Readers
2019-02-22HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2019-02-07HouseHouse Second Readers
2019-02-06HouseHouse First Readers
2019-02-05HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback