GA HB1209 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-17 - Effective Date 2022-02-17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 17 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-17 - Effective Date 2022-02-17
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act creating the Board of Education of Greene County, approved March 12, 1986 (Ga. L. 1986, p. 3696), as amended, particularly by an Act approved October 1, 2001 (Ga. L. 2001, Ex. Sess., p. 693), by an Act approved September 21, 2011 (Ga. L. 2011, Ex. Sess., p. 417), and by an Act approved March 18, 2013 (Ga. L. 2013, p. 3519), so as to change the description of the education districts; to provide for definitions and inclusions; to provide for continuation in office of current members; to provide for effective dates; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Greene County; Board of Education; change description of districts
Sponsors
Rep. Trey Rhodes [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-15 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #515 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #501 (Y: 147 N: 10 NV: 8 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #501 (Y: 147 N: 10 NV: 8 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-17 | Effective Date 2022-02-17 | |
2022-02-17 | Act 475 | |
2022-02-17 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2022-02-16 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Senate Transmitted House |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-02-10 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2022-02-10 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-02-10 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-02-08 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-02-07 | House | House First Readers |
2022-02-03 | House | House Hopper |