GA HB1200 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-08 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Intragovernmental Coordination Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-08 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Intragovernmental Coordination Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to authorize the governing authority of the City of Brookhaven to levy an excise tax pursuant to the authority of subsection (b) of Code Section 48-13-51 of the O.C.G.A., approved May 8, 2017 (Ga. L. 2017, p. 3992), so as to repeal provisions regarding expenditure of funds; to repeal an automatic reversion; to repeal a conditional provision; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Brookhaven, City of; levy an excise tax
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-08 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-02-07 | House | House First Readers |
2022-02-03 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/61756 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20212022/205198 |