GA HB1186 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - Effective Date 2022-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 9 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-09 - Effective Date 2022-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 44 of Title 43 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to state speech-language pathology and audiology licensing, so as to allow persons who are not licensed audiologists to use otoacoustic emissions or auditory brainstem response technology as part of a screening process for the initial identification of communication disorders in individuals up to age 22, subject to certain conditions; to provide for compliance with certain notifiable disease reporting requirements; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Speech-language pathologists and audiologists; revise licensing provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Penny Houston [R] | Rep. Matt Dubnik [R] | Rep. Chris Erwin [R] | Rep. Sharon Cooper [R] |
Rep. Jodi Lott [R] | Rep. Martin Momtahan [R] | Sen. Kay Kirkpatrick [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-04 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #851 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - Passage: House Vote #563 (Y: 156 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - House - Passage: House Vote #563 (Y: 156 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 20) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-09 | Effective Date 2022-07-01 | |
2022-05-09 | Act 838 | |
2022-05-09 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2022-04-06 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2022-03-18 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-02-28 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-02-24 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2022-02-24 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-02-17 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2022-02-07 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-02-03 | House | House First Readers |
2022-02-02 | House | House Hopper |