GA HB117 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-06 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 6 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-06 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 8 of Title 34 of the O.C.G.A., relating to employment security, so as to change certain provisions relating to employment security; to modify the definition of the term "most recent employer"; to amend Code Section 50-36-1 of the O.C.G.A., relating to requirements, procedures, and conditions for verification of lawful presence within the United States, exceptions, regulations, and criminal and other penalties for violations, so as to provide a method for such verification of lawful presence that may be utilized in conjunction with the electronic filing of an application for unemployment insurance with the Department of Labor; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Employment security; modify definition of the term most recent employer; change certain provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Hamilton [R] | Rep. Jimmy Pruett [R] | Rep. Barry Fleming [R] | Sen. Brian Strickland [R] |
Rep. Tom Kirby [R] | Rep. Bruce Broadrick [R] | Sen. Joshua McKoon [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-02 - House - House Vote #398 (Y: 161 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - Senate - Senate Vote #303 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - House Vote #60 (Y: 159 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2015-03-31 - Senate - Senate Vote #303 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-02-20 - House - House Vote #60 (Y: 159 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-06 | Effective Date | |
2015-05-06 | Act 113 | |
2015-05-06 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2015-04-09 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2015-04-02 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2015-03-23 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2015-03-20 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2015-02-23 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2015-02-20 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2015-02-20 | House | House Third Readers |
2015-02-19 | House | House Postponed |
2015-02-09 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2015-01-29 | House | House Second Readers |
2015-01-28 | House | House First Readers |
2015-01-27 | House | House Hopper |