GA HB116 | 2017-2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-08 - Senate Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 11 of Title 15 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the Juvenile Code, so as to provide the superior court with exclusive original jurisdiction for cases involving aggravated assault involving the use of a firearm and aggravated battery upon certain individuals; to allow a superior court the discretion to transfer such cases back to juvenile court; to clarify the definitions of a class A or class B designated felony act in light of the jurisdictional changes; to add aggravated assault upon an emergency health worker as a class A designated felony; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Juvenile Code; provide superior court with exclusive original jurisdiction for cases involving aggravated assault; provisions
Sponsors
Rep. Albert Reeves [R] | Rep. Alan Powell [R] | Rep. Robert Trammell [D] | Sen. Brian Strickland [R] |
Sen. Ed Setzler [R] | Rep. Earl Ehrhart [R] | Sen. Tyler Harper [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-27 - House - House Vote #123 (Y: 130 N: 36 NV: 4 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-08 | Senate | Senate Recommitted |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn & Recommitted |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2017-02-27 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2017-02-27 | House | House Third Readers |
2017-02-22 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2017-01-26 | House | House Second Readers |
2017-01-25 | House | House First Readers |
2017-01-24 | House | House Hopper |