GA HB1154 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-02 - Effective Date 2022-03-02
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-02 - Effective Date 2022-03-02
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act creating the Board of Commissioners of Cobb County, approved June 19, 1964 (Ga. L. 1964, Ex. Sess., p. 2075), as amended, particularly by an Act approved April 10, 2014 (Ga. L. 2014, p. 3893), so as to change the description of the commissioner districts; to provide for definitions and inclusions; to provide for continuation in office of current members; to provide for election and terms of office of subsequent members; to provide effective dates; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Cobb County; Board of Commissioners; change description of districts
Sponsors
Rep. John Carson [R] | Sen. Ed Setzler [R] | Rep. Ginny Ehrhart [R] | Rep. Matt Dollar [R] |
Rep. Devan Seabaugh [R] | Rep. Don Parsons [R] | Sen. Kay Kirkpatrick [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-24 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #547 (Y: 33 N: 18 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Motion To Commit: Senate Vote #522 (Y: 31 N: 21 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - Immediately Transmit: House Vote #515 (Y: 95 N: 61 NV: 4 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - Passage: House Vote #514 (Y: 95 N: 64 NV: 1 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - Senate - Motion To Commit: Senate Vote #522 (Y: 31 N: 21 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - Immediately Transmit: House Vote #515 (Y: 95 N: 61 NV: 4 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - Passage: House Vote #514 (Y: 95 N: 64 NV: 1 Abs: 19) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-02 | Effective Date 2022-03-02 | |
2022-03-02 | Act 562 | |
2022-03-02 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2022-03-01 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn & Recommitted |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-02-14 | House | House Immediately Transmitted to Senate |
2022-02-14 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2022-02-14 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-02-10 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-02-03 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-02-02 | House | House First Readers |
2022-02-01 | House | House Hopper |