GA HB1147 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-10 - Effective Date 2022-05-10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-10 - Effective Date 2022-05-10
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 3 of Title 27 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to wildlife generally, so as to authorize the hunting and trapping of raccoons and opossum year round; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Game and fish; hunting and trapping of raccoons and opossum year round; authorize
Sponsors
Rep. Trey Rhodes [R] | Rep. John Corbett [R] | Rep. John LaHood [R] | Rep. Jason Ridley [R] |
Rep. Tyler Smith [R] | Rep. Steven Sainz [R] | Sen. Tyler Harper [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-30 - House - Agree To Senate Substitute: House Vote #823 (Y: 155 N: 10 NV: 1 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #689 (Y: 44 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - Passage: House Vote #523 (Y: 141 N: 17 NV: 5 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2022-03-17 - Senate - Passage By Substitute: Senate Vote #689 (Y: 44 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - Passage: House Vote #523 (Y: 141 N: 17 NV: 5 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-10 | Effective Date 2022-05-10 | |
2022-05-10 | Act 863 | |
2022-05-10 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2022-04-06 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2022-03-30 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2022-03-17 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-02-15 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2022-02-15 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-02-11 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-02-03 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-02-02 | House | House First Readers |
2022-02-01 | House | House Hopper |