GA HB1146 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-02 - Effective Date 2022-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-02 - Effective Date 2022-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Title 40 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to motor vehicles and traffic, so as to provide for vehicles operated by certain law enforcement to be equipped with flashing or revolving lights which are primarily blue in color; to remove a restriction relating to motor vehicles of the Georgia State Patrol; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Motor vehicles; law enforcement vehicles be equipped with primarily blue flashing or revolving lights; provide
Sponsors
Rep. Jodi Lott [R] | Rep. J Collins [R] | Rep. Bill Hitchens [R] | Rep. Eddie Lumsden [R] |
Rep. Lauren McDonald [R] | Sen. John Albers [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-30 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #771 (Y: 49 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - Passage: House Vote #548 (Y: 105 N: 55 NV: 3 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - Passage: House Vote #548 (Y: 105 N: 55 NV: 3 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-02 | Effective Date 2022-07-01 | |
2022-05-02 | Act 765 | |
2022-05-02 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2022-04-06 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2022-03-30 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-02-22 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2022-02-22 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-02-08 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-02-03 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-02-02 | House | House First Readers |
2022-02-01 | House | House Hopper |