GA HB1142 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-02 - Effective Date 2022-03-02
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on March 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-02 - Effective Date 2022-03-02
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act providing for the merger of the existing independent school system of the mayor and council of the City of Athens and the existing school system in the County of Clarke, approved March 7, 1955 (Ga. L. 1955, p. 3057), as amended, particularly by an Act approved March 13, 2012 (Ga. L. 2012, p. 4248), so as to change the description of the education districts; to provide for definitions and inclusions; to provide for the continuation in office of the current members; to provide for effective dates; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Athens, City of; Clarke County; Board of Education; change description of districts
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-22 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #532 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #486 (Y: 148 N: 7 NV: 5 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2022-02-07 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #486 (Y: 148 N: 7 NV: 5 Abs: 19) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-02 | Effective Date 2022-03-02 | |
2022-03-02 | Act 523 | |
2022-03-02 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2022-03-01 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate Transmitted House |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-02-08 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-02-07 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2022-02-07 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-02-07 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-02-03 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-02-02 | House | House First Readers |
2022-02-01 | House | House Hopper |