GA HB1141 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-05-01 - Effective Date 2024-05-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to provide a homestead exemption from Telfair County School District ad valorem taxes for educational purposes in an amount equal to the amount by which the current year assessed value of a homestead exceeds the base year assessed value of such homestead up to a maximum amount; to provide for definitions; to specify the terms and conditions of the exemption and the procedures relating thereto; to provide for applicability; to provide for compliance with constitutional requirements; to provide for a referendum, effective dates, automatic repeal, mandatory execution of election, and judicial remedies regarding failure to comply; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Telfair County; ad valorem tax; educational purposes; provide homestead exemption

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-02-16 - Senate - Local Consent Calendar: Senate Vote #506 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-02-12 - House - Local Calendar : House Vote #457 (Y: 158 N: 0 NV: 16 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-05-01 Effective Date 2024-05-01
2024-05-01 Act 523
2024-05-01HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2024-04-01HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2024-02-16SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2024-02-16SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2024-02-13SenateSenate Read and Referred
2024-02-12HouseHouse Immediately Transmitted to Senate
2024-02-12HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2024-02-12HouseHouse Third Readers
2024-02-12HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2024-02-08HouseHouse Second Readers
2024-02-07HouseHouse First Readers
2024-02-06HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback