GA HB114 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-22 - Effective Date 2021-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on March 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-22 - Effective Date 2021-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 7 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to imposition, rate, computation, and exemptions from state income taxes, so as to revise the tax credit for adoption of foster children; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date and applicability; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Income tax; adoption of foster children; revise tax credit
Sponsors
Rep. Albert Reeves [R] | Rep. Dominic Lariccia [R] | Rep. Mary Oliver [D] | Rep. Josh Bonner [R] |
Rep. Debbie Buckner [D] | Rep. Philip Singleton [R] | Sen. Bo Hatchett [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-18 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #233 (Y: 53 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Motion To Engross: Hb 511, Hb 593, Hb 114, Hb 271, Hb 292, Hb 374: Senate Vote #229 (Y: 32 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - Passage: House Vote #185 (Y: 158 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - Senate - Motion To Engross: Hb 511, Hb 593, Hb 114, Hb 271, Hb 292, Hb 374: Senate Vote #229 (Y: 32 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - Passage: House Vote #185 (Y: 158 N: 0 NV: 18 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-22 | Effective Date 2021-07-01 | |
2021-03-22 | Act 5 | |
2021-03-22 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2021-03-18 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Senate Transmitted House |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2021-03-18 | Senate | Senate Engrossed |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2021-03-08 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2021-03-08 | House | House Third Readers |
2021-03-03 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-02-23 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2021-02-18 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2021-01-28 | House | House Second Readers |
2021-01-27 | House | House First Readers |
2021-01-26 | House | House Hopper |