GA HB1137 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-11 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-11 - House Committee Favorably Reported
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 1 of Chapter 13 of Title 50 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to general provisions of administrative procedure, so as to remove the exemption of administrative review from the Board of Corrections and its penal institutions; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
State government; remove exemption of administrative review from the Board of Corrections and its penal institutions
Sponsors
Rep. William Werkheiser [R] | Rep. Kim Schofield [D] | Rep. Chuck Efstration [R] | Sen. Josh McLaurin [D] |
Rep. James Beverly [D] | Rep. Sandra Scott [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-11 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-02-08 | House | House Withdrawn, Recommitted |
2022-02-03 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-02-02 | House | House First Readers |
2022-02-01 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/61562 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20212022/204532 |