GA HB1134 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - Effective Date 2022-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-25 - Effective Date 2022-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 16-15-4 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to participation in criminal gang activity prohibited, so as to provide for the concurrent authority of prosecuting attorneys and the Attorney General to prosecute offenses involving criminal gang activity; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Crimes and offenses; prosecute offenses involving criminal gang activity; provide for concurrent authority
Sponsors
Rep. Chuck Efstration [R] | Rep. Josh Bonner [R] | Rep. Jodi Lott [R] | Rep. Lauren McDonald [R] |
Rep. Steven Meeks [R] | Sen. John Kennedy [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-28 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #722 (Y: 50 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - Passage: House Vote #511 (Y: 101 N: 56 NV: 3 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - Passage: House Vote #511 (Y: 101 N: 56 NV: 3 Abs: 19) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-25 | Effective Date 2022-07-01 | |
2022-04-25 | Act 645 | |
2022-04-25 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2022-04-06 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2022-03-28 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-02-14 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2022-02-14 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-02-10 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-02-03 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-02-02 | House | House First Readers |
2022-02-01 | House | House Hopper |