GA HB1129 | 2011-2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-11 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-11 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act creating the Town of Braselton Community Improvement District, approved May 29, 2007 (Ga. L. 2007, p. 4100), so as to allow the district to apply for, receive, administer, or utilize grants from federal, state, county, or municipal governments or agencies or any other public sources under certain conditions; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Town of Braselton Community Improvement District; apply for, receive, administer, or utilize grants from federal, state, county or municipal governments under certain conditions; allow
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-05 - Senate - Senate Vote #556 - Local Consent Calendar (Y: 40 N: 2 NV: 8 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - House Vote #540 - Local Calendar (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 20 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - House Vote #540 - Local Calendar (Y: 144 N: 0 NV: 20 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-11 | Effective Date | |
2012-04-11 | Act 514 | |
2012-04-11 | House Date Signed by Governor | |
2012-04-03 | House Sent to Governor | |
2012-03-05 | Senate Passed/Adopted | |
2012-03-05 | Senate Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-02-28 | Senate Read and Referred | |
2012-02-27 | House Passed/Adopted | |
2012-02-27 | House Third Readers | |
2012-02-27 | House Committee Favorably Reported | |
2012-02-24 | House Second Readers | |
2012-02-23 | House First Readers |