GA HB1115 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-02-29 - Senate Read and Referred
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 8 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to sales and use taxes, so as to revise provisions for the maximum allowable sales and use tax rate; to remove the prohibition of simultaneously levying a LOST and a HOST; to phase out certain local sales taxes and authorize a new flexible penny local option sales tax ('FLOST'); to provide for audits and reports; to provide for the withholding of funds by the state under certain circumstances; to amend Article 2 of Chapter 9 of Title 32 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the Metropolitan Atlanta Rapid Transit Authority (MARTA), so as to remove provisions exempting certain retail sales and use taxes from the cap on local sales taxes; to provide for related matters; to provide an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sales and use tax; revise provisions for maximum allowable tax rate; remove prohibition of simultaneously levying a LOST and a HOST

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2024-02-27 - House - Passage: House Vote #573 (Y: 167 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2024-02-29SenateSenate Read and Referred
2024-02-27HouseHouse Passed/Adopted By Substitute
2024-02-27HouseHouse Third Readers
2024-02-21HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2024-02-07HouseHouse Second Readers
2024-02-06HouseHouse First Readers
2024-02-01HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback