GA HB111 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 4 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 1 of Title 7 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to financial institutions, so as to clarify and remove superfluous language; to update terminology; to remove outdated language; to amend Chapter 3 of Title 7 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to installment loans, so as to provide for deferments of installment loans; to amend Chapter 6A of Title 7 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the Georgia Fair Lending Act, so as to update citations; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Financial institutions; clarify and remove superfluous language; provisions

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-15 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #212 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - Passage: House Vote #57 (Y: 160 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-07-01 Effective Date
2021-05-04 Act 174
2021-05-04HouseHouse Date Signed by Governor
2021-04-05HouseHouse Sent to Governor
2021-03-15SenateSenate Passed/Adopted
2021-03-15SenateSenate Third Read
2021-03-01SenateSenate Read Second Time
2021-02-26SenateSenate Committee Favorably Reported
2021-02-22SenateSenate Read and Referred
2021-02-18HouseHouse Passed/Adopted
2021-02-18HouseHouse Third Readers
2021-02-11HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported
2021-01-28HouseHouse Second Readers
2021-01-27HouseHouse First Readers
2021-01-26HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback