GA HB1097 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-03 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Intragovernmental Coordination Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-03 - House Second Readers
Pending: House Intragovernmental Coordination Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to reconstitute the Meriwether County Board of Education, approved March 28, 1985 (Ga. L. 1985, p. 4611), as amended, so as to change the description of the education districts; to provide for definitions and inclusions; to provide for continuation in office of current members; to provide for related matters; to provide effective dates; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Meriwether County; Board of Education; change description of districts
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-03 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-02-02 | House | House First Readers |
2022-02-01 | House | House Hopper |
Georgia State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.legis.ga.gov/legislation/61513 |
Text | https://www.legis.ga.gov/api/legislation/document/20212022/204447 |