GA HB1090 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on August 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-05 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on August 5 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-05 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 1 of Title 34 of the O.C.G.A., relating to general provisions regarding labor and industrial relations, so as to revise provisions regarding employer's obligation to provide break time for an employee to express breast milk; to revise a definition; to provide for requirements for such employers; to provide for exceptions; to amend Chapter 1 of Title 45 of the O.C.G.A., relating to general provisions regarding public officers and employees, so as to require state entities and local governments to provide reasonable break time to an employee who needs to express breast milk; to provide for a definition; to provide for requirements for such state entities and local governments; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Labor and industrial relations; provisions regarding employer's obligation to provide break time for an employee to express breast milk; revise
Sponsors
Rep. Deborah Silcox [R] | Rep. Jan Jones [R] | Rep. Sharon Cooper [R] | Rep. James Hatchett [R] |
Rep. Katie Dempsey [R] | Sen. Zahra Karinshak [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-26 - House - House Vote #779 (Y: 150 N: 13 NV: 8 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #750 (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - House Vote #607 (Y: 145 N: 16 NV: 4 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2020-06-25 - Senate - Senate Vote #750 (Y: 45 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2020-03-12 - House - House Vote #607 (Y: 145 N: 16 NV: 4 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-05 | Effective Date | |
2020-08-05 | Act 595 | |
2020-08-05 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2020-07-01 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2020-06-26 | House | House Agreed Senate Amend or Sub |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2020-06-25 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2020-06-23 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2020-06-16 | Senate | Senate Withdrawn & Recommitted |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-03-12 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2020-03-12 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-03-05 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-03-04 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-03-03 | House | House First Readers |
2020-03-03 | House | House Hopper |