GA HB109 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-18 - House Withdrawn, Recommitted
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 3 of Title 47 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to the Teachers Retirement System of Georgia, so as to modify conditions of the Teachers Retirement System of Georgia for individuals who first became members on or after July 1, 2019; to revise the computation of earnable compensation; to revise the definition of average final compensation; to modify the employee contribution rate; to prohibit creditable service for unused sick leave; to modify provisions for normal retirement age; to modify the vesting period; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Teachers Retirement System; individuals who first became members on or after July 1, 2019; modify conditions

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-18HouseHouse Withdrawn, Recommitted
2019-02-27HouseHouse Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute
2019-02-06HouseHouse Second Readers
2019-02-05HouseHouse First Readers
2019-01-30HouseHouse Hopper

Georgia State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback