GA HB1089 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-02 - Effective Date 2022-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-02 - Effective Date 2022-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 2 of Chapter 9 of Title 48 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to road tax on motor carriers, so as to increase the penalty for certain violations of registration requirements for motor vehicles operated by motor carriers; to provide for related matters; to provide for an effective date; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Revenue and taxation; certain violations of registration requirements for motor vehicles operated by motor carriers; increase penalty
Sponsors
Rep. Vance Smith [R] | Rep. Jason Ridley [R] | Rep. John Corbett [R] | Rep. Marcus Wiedower [R] |
Sen. Lindsey Tippins [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-25 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #714 (Y: 48 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - Passage: House Vote #513 (Y: 151 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 19) [PASS]
2022-02-14 - House - Passage: House Vote #513 (Y: 151 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 19) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-02 | Effective Date 2022-07-01 | |
2022-05-02 | Act 763 | |
2022-05-02 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2022-04-06 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2022-03-25 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-02-14 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2022-02-14 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-02-08 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-02-02 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-02-01 | House | House First Readers |
2022-01-27 | House | House Hopper |