GA HB1086 | 2021-2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-02 - Effective Date 2022-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Passed on May 2 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-02 - Effective Date 2022-07-01
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Code Section 31-7-18 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to influenza vaccinations for discharged patients aged 65 and older, vaccinations or other measures for health care workers in hospitals, immunity from liability, and standing orders, so as to lower the age to 50 years old for hospitals to offer inpatients vaccinations for the influenza virus prior to discharge; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Health; influenza vaccinations for discharged patients; lower age to 50
Sponsors
Rep. Katie Dempsey [R] | Rep. Sharon Cooper [R] | Rep. Shelly Hutchinson [D] | Rep. Mark Newton [R] |
Rep. Karla Drenner [D] | Sen. Ben Watson [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-22 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #696 (Y: 52 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - Passage: House Vote #546 (Y: 153 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2022-02-22 - House - Passage: House Vote #546 (Y: 153 N: 3 NV: 3 Abs: 20) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-02 | Effective Date 2022-07-01 | |
2022-05-02 | Act 761 | |
2022-05-02 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2022-04-06 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2022-03-22 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2022-03-04 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2022-03-03 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-02-24 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2022-02-22 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2022-02-22 | House | House Third Readers |
2022-02-10 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2022-02-02 | House | House Second Readers |
2022-02-01 | House | House First Readers |
2022-01-27 | House | House Hopper |