GA HB1085 | 2015-2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-01 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Chapter 6 of Title 49 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to services for the aging, so as to transfer the oversight of such services to the Department of Community Health; to provide for the department to establish a community care unit within the Division of Medical Assistance; to delete certain provisions related to the implementation of a community care system; to provide for an annual community care plan to be incorporated into the State Plan for Medical Assistance; to change references to agency to department; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Social services; aging; transfer oversight of such services to the Department of Community Health
Sponsors
Rep. Katie Dempsey [R] | Rep. Terry England [R] | Rep. Butch Parrish [R] | Rep. Sharon Cooper [R] |
Rep. James Hatchett [R] | Rep. Penny Houston [R] | Sen. Dean Burke [R] |
Roll Calls
2016-03-24 - Senate - Senate Vote #710 (Y: 51 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #682 (Y: 40 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - House - House Vote #631 (Y: 158 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2016-03-22 - Senate - Senate Vote #682 (Y: 40 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-26 - House - House Vote #631 (Y: 158 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 16) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-01 | Effective Date | |
2016-05-03 | Act 547 | |
2016-05-03 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2016-04-05 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2016-03-24 | Senate | Senate Taken from Table |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Senate Tabled |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-02-29 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2016-02-26 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2016-02-26 | House | House Third Readers |
2016-02-24 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2016-02-24 | House | House Second Readers |
2016-02-23 | House | House First Readers |
2016-02-23 | House | House Hopper |