GA HB1083 | 2023-2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Effective Date 2024-04-23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-23 - Effective Date 2024-04-23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend Article 7 of Chapter 3 of Title 37 of the Official Code of Georgia Annotated, relating to adult residential mental health services licensing, so as to extend grace periods applicable to the Department of Community Health, including creation and promulgation of rules and regulations and the issuance of a one-time provisional license; to extend the grace period for adult residential mental health programs to obtain licensure and the time during which they may continue to operate before being deemed an "unlicensed adult residential mental health program"; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Community Health, Department of; adult residential mental health services licensing; extend grace periods
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-20 - Senate - Passage: Senate Vote #701 (Y: 49 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - Passage: House Vote #475 (Y: 161 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2024-02-13 - House - Passage: House Vote #475 (Y: 161 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-23 | Effective Date 2024-04-23 | |
2024-04-23 | Act 475 | |
2024-04-23 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2024-04-01 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Senate Third Read |
2024-03-07 | Senate | Senate Read Second Time |
2024-03-05 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2024-02-15 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2024-02-13 | House | House Passed/Adopted By Substitute |
2024-02-13 | House | House Third Readers |
2024-02-07 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported By Substitute |
2024-02-01 | House | House Second Readers |
2024-01-31 | House | House First Readers |
2024-01-30 | House | House Hopper |