GA HB1075 | 2019-2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 30 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-30 - Effective Date
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL to be entitled an Act to amend an Act to continue the existence of the Atlanta Independent School System under the management and control of the Atlanta Board of Education, approved June 3, 2003 (Ga. L. 2003, p. 4154), as amended, particularly by an Act approved May 6, 2013 (Ga. L. 2013, p. 4341), so as to provide for staggered terms for members of the board of education; to provide for related matters; to repeal conflicting laws; and for other purposes.
Title
Atlanta, City of; Board of Education; provide for staggered terms for members
Sponsors
Rep. Betsy Holland [D] | Rep. Patricia Gardner [D] | Rep. David Dreyer [D] | Rep. Derrick Jackson [D] |
Rep. Becky Evans [D] | Rep. Deborah Silcox [R] | Sen. Jennifer Jordan [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-19 - Senate - Senate Vote #659 (Y: 50 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - House Vote #552 (Y: 153 N: 1 NV: 12 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2020-03-10 - House - House Vote #552 (Y: 153 N: 1 NV: 12 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-30 | Effective Date | |
2020-06-30 | Act 419 | |
2020-06-30 | House | House Date Signed by Governor |
2020-06-29 | House | House Sent to Governor |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Senate Passed/Adopted |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Senate Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Senate Read and Referred |
2020-03-10 | House | House Passed/Adopted |
2020-03-10 | House | House Third Readers |
2020-03-10 | House | House Committee Favorably Reported |
2020-03-03 | House | House Second Readers |
2020-03-02 | House | House First Readers |
2020-02-28 | House | House Hopper |